+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/31/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor