+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 34
- Effective date(s) 03/22/2013
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/25/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/13/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87