+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 84
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/17/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/4/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/24/2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Meeting Cancelled. Reset on Business and Utilities Subcommittee cal. for next meeting.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/17/2015
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- Ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
- P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.