+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 142
- Effective date(s) 04/05/2019
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0150)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0024)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 54, Nays 27, PNV 6
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/26/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
- Reassigned to Commerce Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 7, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 6
March 7, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 26, 2019: HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 19, 2019: HOUSE BUSINESS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor