+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 357
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/25/2017
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/25/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/18/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/12/2017
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.