+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 469
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (13)
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 1, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 24, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
March 24, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor