+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 36
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/2/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
- Meeting Canceled
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- P2C held on desk.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction