+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 281
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0302)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0060)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 2, PNV 1
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 3, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0142)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/7/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2015
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/18/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (16)
April 15, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 7, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 1, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 1, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 24, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 24, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 18, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
March 18, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor