+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to White Paper Report
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/6/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor