+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 24, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 18, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
March 18, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor