+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 203
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 4
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/8/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/28/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/22/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (10)
April 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 20, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 20, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95