+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 467
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 7
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0271)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0133)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 24, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 24, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 20, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 12, 2019: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor