+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0223
Amendment 1-0 to HB0720
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor