+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 279
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction