+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/7/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
March 30, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor