+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 416
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to last calendar
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/6/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0239
Amendment 1-0 to HB0709
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 18, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 27, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 20, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor