+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 231
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/5/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0074
Amendment 1-0 to HB0704
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 19, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 5, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 20, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor