+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
- Move to Heel
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/8/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/1/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor