+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Move to Heel
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 5/1/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Study Subcommittee
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
May 1, 2017: STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE OF FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 11, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 11, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 5, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
April 5, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor