+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/19
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 4/3/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
- No Action Taken
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/6/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee to 2/26/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/12/2019
On January 27, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c House Education Administration Subcommittee
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction