+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/13/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Ref. to Local Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- P2C held on desk.
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor