+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 67
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/5/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 5, 2019: HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 26, 2019: HOUSE BUSINESS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor