+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Failed for lack of second in: Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/31/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor