+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 25, 2019: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 19, 2019: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 13, 2019: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor