+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1024
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Sales Tax Calendar
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 20, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 19, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 18, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
VanHuss
Type:
Primary Sponsor