+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
- Action def. in Judiciary to 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/27/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 3, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 19, 2019: HOUSE CHILDREN & FAMILIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor