+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/14/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/7/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reconsidered, Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
- Failed in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/31/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/31/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning--Government Operations for review
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (17)
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 21, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 14, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 14, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 7, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
April 7, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
April 7, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 31, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 31, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 31, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor