+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
- Placed behind the budget
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/26/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/12/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor