+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/31/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 31, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 25, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
March 25, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor