+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 761
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2020
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 87, Nays 0 PNV 1 HB0656
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/17/20
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0640)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0181)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 4, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/19/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
June 17, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 17, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 4
April 17, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2019: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 13, 2019: HOUSE MENTAL HEALTH & SUBSTANCE ABUSE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
M. Hill
Type:
Primary Sponsor