+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Failed for lack of motion in: Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/13/2018
- Move to Heel
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/14/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee-- Criminal Justice
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor