+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
- Pub. Ch. 226
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/16/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
On February 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
March 29, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 10, 2021: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor