+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 63
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/5/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- Reassigned to Local Government Committee
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.