+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 306
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/10/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred To: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/12/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0122
Amendment 1-0 to HB0647
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 3, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 12, 2013: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 5, 2013: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor