+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 512
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0296)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0387)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 16, 2019: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 3, 2019: HOUSE MENTAL HEALTH & SUBSTANCE ABUSE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor