+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 11, Nays 18, PNV 1
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 1
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (9)
April 14, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 8, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 8, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 8, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
March 24, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor