+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2014
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor