+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 409
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Final Calendar for 5/2/19
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/30/2019
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2019
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/30/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
- Placed behind the budget
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 30, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 30, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 9, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 2, 2019: HOUSE CHILDREN & FAMILIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor