+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/9/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/17/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (8)
April 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 16, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
March 24, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 11, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
March 11, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor