+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 317
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/7/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (8)
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 7, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
April 1, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor