+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 512
- Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0453)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0456)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/24/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/17/2021
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/9/2021
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Ref. to Education Administration
- P2C held on desk.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
May 4, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 24, 2021: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 9, 2021: HOUSE HIGHER EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
April 13, 2011: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1
April 5, 2011: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee
March 2, 2011: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor