+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Sponsor change.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor