+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor