+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor