+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 468
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/21
- Reset on cal. for 5/3/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021
- Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- Ref. to Health Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 29, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 21, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 6, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor