+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 197
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0578
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/13/2017
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0248)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0023)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2017
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 90
April 3, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 16, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 16, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 16, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 1, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 1, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 21, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 21, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor