+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/16/2013
- Pub. Ch. 166
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0207)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/26/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0207
Amendment 1-0 to HB0554
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 29
March 28, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 20, 2013: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor