+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/18/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/11/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/11/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (10)
May 4, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 4, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 26, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 26, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 26, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 26, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 18, 2017: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 18, 2017: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 11, 2017: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
April 11, 2017: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor