+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 1/6/2016
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee--Civil Justice
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor