+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 9, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0041)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/5/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
March 14, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
March 5, 2019: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
February 27, 2019: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor